US HB401 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
River Raisin National Battlefield Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior, if offered by Monroe or Wayne Counties, Michigan, or other willing landowners in either county, to accept a donation of real property in either county relating to the Battles of River Raisin (during the War of 1812) on January 18 and 22, 1813, and their aftermath. Instructs the Secretary, upon acquisition of such real property of sufficient acreage to permit efficient administration, to designate the acquired real property as a unit of the National Park System, to be known as the "River Raisin National Battlefield Park."Requires the Secretary to submit a report describing the progress made in acquiring real property under this Act and in designating the park.
Title
River Raisin National Battlefield Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Dingell [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-11.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB110 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB110 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Land transfers
Michigan
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Michigan
Military history
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/401/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr401/BILLS-111hr401ih.pdf |