US HB402 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To promote international efforts in combating corruption, kleptocracy, and illicit finance by foreign officials and other foreign persons, including through a new anti-corruption action fund, and for other purposes.
Title
CROOK Act Countering Russian and Other Overseas Kleptocracy Act
Sponsors
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX] |
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] |
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB158 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB3524 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 486.
HB3524 (Related) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 486.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/402/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr402/BILLS-117hr402ih.pdf |