US HB4039 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the use of funds supporting any activities within the Xinjiang Uyghur Autonomous Region of the People's Republic of China.
Title
No Dollars to Uyghur Forced Labor Act
Sponsors
Rep. Nathaniel Moran [R-TX] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2024-02-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-02-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H554) |
2024-02-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4039. |
2024-02-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H554-555) |
2024-02-13 | House | Mrs. Kim (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-06-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 0. |
2023-06-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-06-12 | House | Introduced in House |