US HB4252 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 614.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 614.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Inland Empire Perchlorate Ground Water Plume Assessment Act of 2010 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Director of the United States Geological Survey (USGS), to complete a study of water resources in the Rialto-Colton Basin, California, including: (1) a survey of ground water resources in the Basin (including the identification of a recent surge in perchlorate concentrations in ground water); and (2) a characterization of surface and bedrock geology of the Basin, including the effect of the geology on ground water yield and quality. Directs the Secretary to: (1) carry out the study in coordination with California and any other appropriate entities, including other federal agencies and institutions of higher education; and (2) report to specified congressional committees on results of the study.
Title
Inland Empire Perchlorate Ground Water Plume Assessment Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Baca [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 614. | |
2010-09-27 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 111-328. | |
2010-07-21 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2010-06-09 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. | |
2010-03-19 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2010-03-18 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-03-18 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1613-1614) | |
2010-03-18 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4252. | |
2010-03-18 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1613-1616) | |
2010-03-18 | Ms. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249. | |
2010-03-11 | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-433. | |
2010-02-24 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | |
2010-02-24 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-02-24 | Subcommittee on Water and Power Discharged. | |
2009-12-11 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power. | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2316 (Related) 2009-09-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
California
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Hydrology and hydrography
Water quality
Water resources development
Water use and supply
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Hydrology and hydrography
Water quality
Water resources development
Water use and supply