US HB4309 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 485.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 485.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Sikes Act (conservation programs on federal lands) to allow funds appropriated to the Department of Defense (DOD) that are obligated to cooperative agreements with states, local governments, Indian tribes, nongovernmental organizations, and individuals for maintenance and improvement of natural resources located off of military or state-owned National Guard installations (but that are related to current or anticipated military activities) to be: paid in a lump sum and include an amount intended to cover the future costs of the activities under the agreement; invested by the recipient in accordance with the recipient's own investment management guidelines, with any investment interest or income permitted to be applied for the same purposes as the principal; and used only for the direct costs of maintaining and improving the natural resources pursuant to an approved DOD Integrated Natural Resource Management Plan and for certain indirect and administrative costs that do not exceed 10% of the total cost of the project. Allows such cooperative agreements to be used to acquire property or services for the direct benefit or use of the U.S. government. Prohibits amounts available to DOD from being used under such Act to acquire fee title interest in real property for such natural resources projects that are not on a military installation. Requires the Inspector General of DOD to: (1) conduct an audit of the natural resources projects funded with amounts available to DOD under the Sikes Act that are not on a military installation, and (2) report to Congress on the audit by October 1, 2018. Terminates this Act on October 1, 2019, except that any cooperative agreement entered into under this Act on or before September 30, 2019, shall continue.
Title
To amend the Sikes Act to make certain improvements to the administration of cooperative agreements for land management related to Department of Defense readiness activities, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 485. |
2014-12-08 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2014-12-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-647, Part I. |
2014-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2014-04-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-04-09 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1960 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 126.
HB1080 (Related) 2013-06-17 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-115, Part I.
HB1080 (Related) 2013-06-17 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-115, Part I.
Subjects
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military facilities and property
Military readiness
Public lands and natural resources
Land use and conservation
Military facilities and property
Military readiness
Public lands and natural resources