US HB4374 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 466.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To bolster certain rural broadband programs of the Department of Agriculture.
Title
Broadband Internet Connections for Rural America Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 466. |
2022-12-16 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2022-12-08 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 15, 2022. |
2022-11-14 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 8, 2022. |
2022-09-22 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 14, 2022. |
2022-09-09 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 22, 2022. |
2022-07-29 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 12, 2022. |
2022-07-15 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 29, 2022. |
2022-06-28 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 15, 2022. |
2022-05-24 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 28, 2022. |
2022-05-06 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than May 26, 2022. |
2022-04-29 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than May 6, 2022. |
2022-03-18 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than April 29, 2022. |
2022-01-21 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than March 18, 2022. |
2021-12-03 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Jan. 21, 2022. |
2021-11-18 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 3, 2021. |
2021-11-05 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 18, 2021. |
2021-10-28 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 5, 2021. |
2021-09-24 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 28, 2021. |
2021-08-06 | House | House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 24, 2021. |
2021-08-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 117-113, Part I. |
2021-07-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2021-07-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |