US HB44 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits any state whose congressional districts have been redistricted after a decennial census from carrying out another redistricting until after the next apportionment of Representatives following a decennial census, unless a court requires such state to conduct a subsequent redistricting to comply with the Constitution or enforce the Voting Rights Act of 1965. The bill is applicable to any congressional redistricting which occurs after the regular decennial census conducted during 2020.
Title
Coretta Scott King Mid-Decade Redistricting Prohibition Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB124 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB130 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB130 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Census and government statistics
Congress
Congressional districts and representation
Constitution and constitutional amendments
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
State and local government operations
Voting rights
Congress
Congressional districts and representation
Constitution and constitutional amendments
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
State and local government operations
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/44/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr44/BILLS-116hr44ih.pdf |