US HB4469 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-15 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-15 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to provide for the protection of child custody arrangements for parents who are members deployed in support of a contingency operation. States that if a motion for change of custody of a child of such a member is filed while the member is so deployed, no court may enter an order modifying or amending a previous child custody judgment, except if the court finds that it is in the best interest of the child. Prohibits any court from considering a member's absence due to deployment, or possible deployment, in support of a contingency operation in determining the best interest of the child.
Title
To amend the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to provide for protection of child custody arrangements for parents who are members of the Armed Forces deployed in support of a contingency operation.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Akin [R-MO] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. John Boehner [R-OH] | Rep. Jo Bonner [R-AL] |
Rep. Leonard Boswell [D-IA] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Ginny Brown-Waite [R-FL] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] |
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. Gabrielle Giffords [D-AZ] | Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA] |
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Jack Kingston [R-GA] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] |
Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Steven LaTourette [R-OH] | Rep. Thaddeus McCotter [R-MI] |
Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Solomon Ortiz [D-TX] |
Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] | Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Jean Schmidt [R-OH] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] | Rep. John Spratt [D-SC] |
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . | |
2010-07-15 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-02-25 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2010-01-22 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Judicial procedure and administration
Military personnel and dependents
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Judicial procedure and administration
Military personnel and dependents
Separation, divorce, custody, support
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/4469/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr4469/BILLS-111hr4469ih.pdf |