US HB4501 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Growth and Investment Act of 2014 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to increase: (1) the expensing allowance for depreciable business property to $250,000 for taxable years beginning after 2013, and (2) the threshold level for such property over which the expensing allowance is reduced to $800,000.
Title
Small Business Growth and Investment Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4457 (Related) 2014-06-17 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 434.
SB1298 (Related) 2013-07-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1342 (Same As) 2013-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1298 (Related) 2013-07-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1342 (Same As) 2013-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4501/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4501/BILLS-113hr4501ih.pdf |