US HB454 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Trail of Tears Documentation Act - Amends the National Trails System Act to add as components of the Trail of Tears National Historic Trail, as generally described in the environmentally preferred alternative of the November 2007 Feasibility Study Amendment and Environmental Assessment for Trail of Tears National Historic Trail, the following routes and land components by which the Cherokee Nation was removed to Oklahoma: (1) the Benge and Bell routes; (2) the land components of the designated water routes in Alabama, Arkansas, Oklahoma, and Tennessee; (3) the routes from the collection forts in Alabama, Georgia, North Carolina, and Tennessee to the emigration depots; and (4) the related campgrounds located along such routes and land components. Prohibits acquisition of lands or interests in lands outside the exterior boundaries of any federally administered area by the federal government for the Trail of Tears National Historic Trail except with the consent of the owner.
Title
Trail of Tears Documentation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Heath Shuler [D-NC] | Rep. Zach Wamp [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-11.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
Subjects
Alabama
Arkansas
Federal-Indian relations
Georgia
Government investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
North Carolina
Oklahoma
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Property rights
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee
Arkansas
Federal-Indian relations
Georgia
Government investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
North Carolina
Oklahoma
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Property rights
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/454/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr454/BILLS-111hr454ih.pdf |