US HB455 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Missisquoi and Trout Rivers Wild and Scenic River Study Act of 2009 - Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate a specified segment of the Missisquoi and Trout Rivers in Vermont for study for potential addition to the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to: (1) analyze any potential impacts on the possession or use of a weapon, trap, or net, including a concealed weapon, on the Missisquoi and Trout Rivers or on lands adjacent to that area; (2) include in the study an assessment of any effect a wild and scenic designation in the study area is likely to have on energy production, transmission, or conveyance; and (3) analyze the potential impact of the designation on private lands within the Rivers or adjacent to that area.
Title
Missisquoi and Trout Rivers Wild and Scenic River Study Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-11.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
Subjects
Electric power generation and transmission
Firearms and explosives
Government investigations
Lakes and rivers
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Vermont
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Firearms and explosives
Government investigations
Lakes and rivers
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Vermont
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/455/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr455/BILLS-111hr455ih.pdf |