US HB4576 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Access to Pacific Fisheries Act This bill authorizes the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to promulgate regulations to implement U.S. participation in the North Pacific Fisheries Convention and South Pacific Fisheries Convention. These conventions are designed to ensure the long-term conservation and sustainable use of fishery resources and marine ecosystems in the North Pacific and South Pacific Ocean of the United States. The North Pacific Fisheries Commission and the Commission of the South Pacific Regional Fisheries Management Organisation were both established by the North and South Pacific fishery conventions, respectively. The United States must be represented by five commissioners on the North Pacific commission and not more than three on the South Pacific commission. In addition, permanent advisory committees are established to represent groups concerned with the fishery resources covered by each convention. The Department of State has certain authority and responsibilities with respect to both commissions. NOAA and the U.S. Coast Guard are required to administer and enforce this bill. This bill lists fishing and shipping activities that are prohibited in the North and South Pacific Ocean. The bill also amends the Western and Central Pacific Fisheries Convention Implementation Act to include commercial fishing as practical experience the President should consider when selecting a commissioner for the Western and Central Pacific Fisheries Commission. The advisory committee is required to submit agenda recommendations at least 15 days prior to the annual Western and Central Pacific Fisheries Commission meeting. The recommendations must be considered in formulating the U.S. position for meetings and negotiations. In addition, NOAA should conduct negotiations to secure agreements with other nations to ensure access and equal treatment of United States fishing boats in the Western and Central Pacific Ocean while taking conservation and management measures into consideration.
Title
Ensuring Access to Pacific Fisheries Act
Sponsors
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5280-5285) |
2016-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4576. |
2016-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5280-5286) |
2016-09-12 | House | Mrs. Radewagen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 557. |
2016-09-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-718. |
2016-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-12 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2016-03-01 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2016-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3269 (Related) 2015-08-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
SB1335 (Related) 2016-05-18 - Held at the desk.
SB1336 (Related) 2016-04-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 419.
SB1335 (Related) 2016-05-18 - Held at the desk.
SB1336 (Related) 2016-04-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 419.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
American Samoa
Assault and harassment offenses
Biological and life sciences
Business records
Coast guard
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Commerce
Department of Homeland Security
Department of State
Federal district courts
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Guam
Hawaii
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial review and appeals
Jurisdiction and venue
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Northern Mariana Islands
Pacific Ocean
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Trade restrictions
U.S. territories and protectorates
Advisory bodies
American Samoa
Assault and harassment offenses
Biological and life sciences
Business records
Coast guard
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Commerce
Department of Homeland Security
Department of State
Federal district courts
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Guam
Hawaii
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial review and appeals
Jurisdiction and venue
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Northern Mariana Islands
Pacific Ocean
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Trade restrictions
U.S. territories and protectorates