US HB4588 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 183.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 183.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Stevenson-Wydler Technology Innovation Act of 1980 to establish a regional technology and innovation hub program, and for other purposes.
Title
Regional Innovation Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 183. |
2022-02-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 117-254. |
2021-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2021-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1260 (Related) 2021-06-08 - Passed Senate, under the order of 5/28/21, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 68 - 32. Record Vote Number: 226. (text: CR S4049-4499)