US HB4590 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Federal banking regulators to jointly conduct a study and develop a strategic plan to address challenges faced by proposed depository institutions seeking de novo depository institution charters; and for other purposes.
Title
Promoting New and Diverse Depository Institutions Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2022-07-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-07-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7150-7151) |
2022-07-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4590. |
2022-07-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7150-7152) |
2022-07-26 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 163. |
2022-01-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 117-229. |
2021-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2021-07-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2543 (Related) 2022-06-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.