US HB4761 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-254. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-254. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes new requirements related to the detection of illicit narcotics at ports of entry. Specifically, U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) must implement a strategy to ensure chemical screening devices are able to identify narcotics at purity levels equal to or less than 10%, or provide an alternate method for identifying narcotics at lower purity levels. The CBP must also test new chemical screening devices at various purity levels before it commits to their acquisition. Additionally, the Department of Homeland Security must implement a plan for the long-term development of a centralized spectral database for chemical screening devices.
Title
DHS Opioid Detection Resilience Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 655 (Y: 393 N: 1 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-254. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-23 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7243) |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 502. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-244. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 393 - 1 (Roll no. 655). (text: CR H9367) |
2019-12-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9380-9381) |
2019-12-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4761. |
2019-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9367-9369) |
2019-12-09 | House | Ms. Clarke (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 260. |
2019-12-03 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2019-12-03 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-319, Part I. |
2019-10-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported. |
2019-10-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3250 (Related) 2020-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB8309 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB8309 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Chemistry
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Customs enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Customs enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding