US HB488 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Decreases the matching funds requirement, and authorizes additional appropriations, for the Keweenaw National Historical Park in Michigan.
Title
To decrease the matching funds requirement and authorize additional appropriations for Keweenaw National Historical Park in the State of Michigan.
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Stupak [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-11.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB135 (Same As) 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB135 (Same As) 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Intergovernmental relations
Michigan
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
Intergovernmental relations
Michigan
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/488/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr488/BILLS-111hr488ih.pdf |