US HB4938 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Respond NOW Act Respond to the Needs in the Opioid War Act
Title
Respond NOW Act Respond to the Needs in the Opioid War Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2018-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-02-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3692 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
HB4907 (Related) 2018-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB2317 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4097 (Related) 2017-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2704 (Related) 2018-04-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4907 (Related) 2018-02-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB2317 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4097 (Related) 2017-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2704 (Related) 2018-04-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Appropriations
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Child health
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First responders and emergency personnel
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government trust funds
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Medical research
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Prescription drugs
Research administration and funding
Student aid and college costs
Worker safety and health
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Child health
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First responders and emergency personnel
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Government trust funds
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Medical research
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Prescription drugs
Research administration and funding
Student aid and college costs
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4938/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4938/BILLS-115hr4938ih.pdf |