US HB5030 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to conduct a management review and submit reports on mental health and suicide prevention efforts carried out by the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA). Specifically, the bill requires the GAO to conduct a management review of the mental health and suicide prevention services provided by the VA. The bill also requires the GAO to report on the VA's efforts to (1) manage veterans at high risk for suicide, (2) integrate mental health care into VA primary care clinics, and (3) integrate community-based mental health care (care provided by a non-VA provider but paid for by the VA) into the Veterans Health Administration.
Title
VA Suicide Prevention Services Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB786 (Related) 2019-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB785 (Related) 2020-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-171. (TXT | PDF)
SB785 (Related) 2020-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-171. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5030/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5030/BILLS-116hr5030ih.pdf |