US HB5145 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to establish and facilitate a Women of Trucking Advisory Board to promote organizations and programs that (1) provide education, training, mentorship, or outreach to women in the trucking industry; and (2) recruit women into the trucking industry.
Title
Promoting Women in Trucking Workforce Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-11-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-11-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2858 (Same As) 2019-11-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Minority employment
Motor carriers
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Women in business
Women's employment
Congressional oversight
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Minority employment
Motor carriers
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Women in business
Women's employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5145/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5145/BILLS-116hr5145ih.pdf |