US HB518 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-115. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-115. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
EPS Improvement Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to exclude from energy conservation standards for external power supplies any power supply circuit, driver, or device designed to power light-emitting diodes (commonly known as LEDs) or to power ceiling fans using direct current motors. The Department of Energy may prescribe new energy conservation standards for that equipment no earlier than one year after the date on which a test procedure has been prescribed.
Title
EPS Improvement Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-115. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8279) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H571-572) |
2017-01-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 518. |
2017-01-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H571-572) |
2017-01-23 | House | Mr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB226 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Held at the desk.
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Energy
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Lighting and heating
Department of Energy
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Lighting and heating