US HB5212 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GREENER Fuels Act Growing Renewable Energy through Existing and New Environmentally Responsible Fuels Act
Title
GREENER Fuels Act Growing Renewable Energy through Existing and New Environmentally Responsible Fuels Act
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2018-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2519 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Business records
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Ecology
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Farmland
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Horticulture and plants
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Motor fuels
Oil and gas
Research and development
User charges and fees
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Business records
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Ecology
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Farmland
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Horticulture and plants
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Motor fuels
Oil and gas
Research and development
User charges and fees
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5212/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5212/BILLS-115hr5212ih.pdf |