US HB5351 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 79-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the transfer of any individual detained at United States Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba. (Sec. 1) This bill prohibits U.S. agency funds from being used until the earlier of the enactment date of an Act authorizing FY2017 appropriations for military activities of the Department of Defense (DOD) or January 21, 2017, for the transfer or release to or within the United States, its territories, or possessions or to any foreign country or entity of an individual detained at Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba. "Individual detained at Guantanamo" means an individual located at Guantanamo as of October 1, 2009, who: (1) is not a U.S. national or a member of the Armed Forces, and (2) is in the custody or under the control of DOD or otherwise detained at Guantanamo.
Title
To prohibit the transfer of any individual detained at United States Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - On Passage (Y: 244 N: 174 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Passage (Y: 244 N: 174 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 238 N: 171 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Passage (Y: 244 N: 174 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 238 N: 171 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-09-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-15 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 244 - 174 (Roll no. 520). (text: CR H5505) |
2016-09-15 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H5511) |
2016-09-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5351. |
2016-09-15 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5351 and H.R. 5226. Rule provides for one hour of debate on both H.R. 5351 and H.R. 5226. |
2016-09-15 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 863. (consideration: CR H5505-5512) |
2016-09-13 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 863 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5351 and H.R. 5226. Rule provides for one hour of debate on both H.R. 5351 and H.R. 5226. |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2016-05-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2999 (Same As) 2016-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Caribbean area
Cuba
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Detention of persons
Executive agency funding and structure
Latin America
Military facilities and property
Terrorism
Caribbean area
Cuba
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Detention of persons
Executive agency funding and structure
Latin America
Military facilities and property
Terrorism