US HB5552 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-30)
Status: Passed on August 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 111-237.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-30)
Status: Passed on August 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 111-237.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms Excise Tax Improvement Act of 2010 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to require: (1) excise taxes on recreational equipment to be due and payable on the date for filing the return for such taxes (i.e., quarterly); and (2) the Secretary of the Treasury to assess and collect, in the same manner as delinquent taxes are assessed and collected, mandatory orders of restitution for victims of crime. Increases by 0.25% in the third quarter of 2015 the estimated tax payments of corporations with assets of not less than $1 billion. Provides for compliance of the budgetary effects of this Act with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010.
Title
Firearms Excise Tax Improvement Act of 2010
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-16 | Became Public Law No: 111-237. | |
2010-08-16 | Signed by President. | |
2010-08-10 | Presented to President. | |
2010-08-06 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-08-05 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-08-05 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6975) | |
2010-07-12 | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 456. | |
2010-06-30 | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. | |
2010-06-29 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-06-29 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 6 (Roll no. 400). (text: CR H4934) | |
2010-06-29 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4943-4944) | |
2010-06-29 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-06-29 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5552. | |
2010-06-29 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4934-4936) | |
2010-06-29 | Mr. Kind moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2010-06-17 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB510 (Related) 2009-01-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB632 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3376)
SB632 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3376)
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Corporate finance and management
Crime victims
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Firearms and explosives
Outdoor recreation
Sales and excise taxes
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Corporate finance and management
Crime victims
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Firearms and explosives
Outdoor recreation
Sales and excise taxes
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation