US HB556 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 68-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Refundable Child Tax Credit Eligibility Verification Reform Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the child tax credit, to require taxpayers claiming such credit to provide their social security numbers on their tax returns. Prohibits taxpayers who improperly claimed such credit in a previous year from claiming such credit during a disallowance period of: (1) 2 years for claims made with reckless or intentional disregard of rules governing such credit, or (2) 10 years for fraudulent claims. Requires the Secretary of the Treasury to prescribe a form for completion by paid income tax preparers in connection with claims for the refundable portion of the child tax credit. Imposes a penalty on preparers who fail to comply with due diligence requirements for claiming the refundable portion of the credit.
Title
Refundable Child Tax Credit Eligibility Verification Reform Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3788 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3885 (Related) 2014-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
SB18 (Related) 2013-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1869 (Related) 2013-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3885 (Related) 2014-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
SB18 (Related) 2013-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1869 (Related) 2013-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Income tax credits
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Income tax credits
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/556/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr556/BILLS-113hr556ih.pdf |