US HB5616 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require reporting regarding accreditation of basic training programs of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.
Title
DHS Basic Training Accreditation Improvement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 390 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-03-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 33 (Roll no. 58). (text: CR H1308-1309) |
2022-03-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1313-1314) |
2022-03-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-03-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5616. |
2022-03-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1308-1310) |
2022-03-07 | House | Mrs. Demings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-02-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 174. |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 117-244, Part I. |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-10-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-26 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability Discharged. |
2021-10-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-10-19 | House | Introduced in House |