US HB5640 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 461.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 461.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 12804 Chillicothe Road in Chesterland, Ohio, as the "Sgt. Wolfgang Kyle Weninger Post Office Building".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 12804 Chillicothe Road in Chesterland, Ohio, as the "Sgt. Wolfgang Kyle Weninger Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Greg Landsman [D-OH] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Max Miller [R-OH] |
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Shontel Brown [D-OH] |
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] | Rep. Emilia Sykes [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 461. |
2024-08-01 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2024-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-06-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-06-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3553) |
2024-06-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5640. |
2024-06-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3553) |
2024-06-03 | House | Mr. Grothman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-02-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-09-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2023-09-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3507 (Same As) 2023-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.