US HB5705 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To support national training, technical assistance, and resource centers, to ensure that all individuals with significant expressive communication disabilities have access to the augmentative and alternative communication the individuals need to interact with others, in order to learn, work, socialize, and take advantage of all aspects of life in the United States.
Title
AACCENT Act Augmentative and Alternative Communication Centers of Excellence and National Technical Assistance Act Nogales Wastewater Improvement Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2023-09-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4643 (Related) 2023-07-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB128 (Related) 2023-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2904 (Related) 2023-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB128 (Related) 2023-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2904 (Related) 2023-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5705/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5705/BILLS-118hr5705ih.pdf |