US HB587 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To modify permitting requirements with respect to the discharge of any pollutant from the Point Loma Wastewater Treatment Plant in certain circumstances, and for other purposes.
Title
Ocean Pollution Reduction Act II
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2021-06-15 | House | Pursuant to section 8 of H. Res. 473, and the motion offered by Mr. McGovern, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 293; H.R. 587; H.R. 610, as amended; H.R. 1144, as amended; H.R. 1703, as amended; H.R. 1921; H.R. 2008; H.R. 2332, as amended; H.R. 2545; and H.R. 3642, as amended. (consideration: CR H2792-2799; text: CR H2792-2793) |
2021-06-15 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 473, proceedings on H.R. 587 are considered vacated. |
2021-06-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 587. |
2021-06-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2759-2761; text: CR H2759-2760) |
2021-06-15 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 24. |
2021-05-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-41. |
2021-03-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 54 - 2. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-24 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR473 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H2716)