US HB604 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bountiful City Land Consolidation Act - Authorizes the Secretary of Agriculture, if the city of Bountiful, Utah, conveys three parcels of land consisting of a total of approximately 1,680 acres to the Secretary, to convey to the city, in exchange for such land, certain federal land identified as Shooting Range Special Use Permit Area on the map entitled "Bountiful City Land Consolidation Act, " dated October 15, 2007.
Title
Bountiful City Land Consolidation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment. | |
2009-01-16 | For further action see P.L. 111-11, Title III, Subtitle D, Section 3307. | |
2009-01-16 | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2009-01-16 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-01-16 | Referred to House Natural Resources | |
2009-01-16 | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-11.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/604/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr604/BILLS-111hr604ih.pdf |