US HB630 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Indian Health Care Improvement Act to establish an urban Indian organization confer policy for the Department of Health and Human Services.
Title
Urban Indian Health Confer Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Mary Peltola [D-AK] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs . |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB460 (Same As) 2023-07-20 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/630/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr630/BILLS-118hr630ih.pdf |