US HB6511 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) vaccines and treatment, as well as treatment for conditions that may complicate COVID-19 treatment, to be covered without cost-sharing under the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) and Medicaid. Additionally, the bill includes vaccines for COVID-19 in the Vaccines for Children (VFC) Program. The VFC Program provides free vaccinations to individuals 18 years of age or younger who are uninsured or underinsured (i.e., with limited or no insurance for vaccines), are eligible for Medicaid, or are American Indians or Alaskan Natives.
Title
Ensuring Vaccination and Treatment Affordability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6674 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4469 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6674 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4469 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medicaid
Poverty and welfare assistance
Child health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medicaid
Poverty and welfare assistance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6511/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6511/BILLS-116hr6511ih.pdf |