US HB6532 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to establish a special enrollment period during the COVID-19 emergency period and to carry out outreach and educational activities, and for other purposes.
Title
COVID Special Enrollment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-04-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6379 (Related) 2020-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6486 (Related) 2020-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3991 (Related) 2020-06-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4469 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6486 (Related) 2020-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3991 (Related) 2020-06-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4469 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Infectious and parasitic diseases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6532/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6532/BILLS-116hr6532ih.pdf |