US HB6599 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009 to make a technical correction to the Navajo Nation Water Resources Development Trust Fund, to amend the Claims Resolution Act of 2010 to make technical corrections to the Taos Pueblo Water Development Fund and Aamodt Settlement Pueblos' Fund, and for other purposes.
Title
Technical Corrections to the Northwestern New Mexico Rural Water Projects Act, Taos Pueblo Indian Water Rights Settlement Act, and Aamodt Litigation Settlement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-12-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-12-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3406 (Same As) 2024-07-25 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6599/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6599/BILLS-118hr6599ih.pdf |