US HB6645 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the National Institute of Mental Health, in coordination with certain other research institutes and centers of the National Institutes of Health, to support mental health research activities related to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019).
Title
To direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services, acting through the Director of the National Institute of Mental Health, to conduct or support research on the mental health consequences of SARS-CoV-2 or COVID-19, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical research
Mental health
Research administration and funding
Worker safety and health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical research
Mental health
Research administration and funding
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6645/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6645/BILLS-116hr6645ih.pdf |