US HB6742 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 54-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To counter the aggression of the Russian Federation against Ukraine and Eastern European allies, to expedite security assistance to Ukraine, to bolster its defense capabilities and those of allies and partners in the region, to impose sanctions relating to the actions of the Russian Federation with respect to Ukraine, and for other purposes.
Title
Never Yielding Europe’s Territory (NYET) Act of 2022 Energy Security Cooperation with Allied Partners in Europe Act Ukraine Democracy Defense Lend-Lease Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, the Budget, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, Energy and Commerce, Rules, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3652 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB6876 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB6876 (Related) 2022-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/6742/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr6742/BILLS-117hr6742ih.pdf |