US HB6768 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fracking Disclosure and Safety Act
Title
Fracking Disclosure and Safety Act
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2018-09-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-09-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2000 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB2001 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB2012 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB4426 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB2001 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB2012 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB4426 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Business records
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian lands and resources rights
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Oil and gas
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water use and supply
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Business records
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian lands and resources rights
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Oil and gas
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6768/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6768/BILLS-115hr6768ih.pdf |