US HB714 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the forfeited profits of Joaquin Archivaldo Guzman Loera (El Chapo) from his illicit drug trafficking enterprise to be reserved for border security measures between the United States and Mexico, including the completion of a wall. Additionally, it requires the forfeited funds from the felony conviction of a member of a drug cartel to be reserved for border security measures between the United States and Mexico, including the completion of a wall.
Title
EL CHAPO Act Ensuring Lawful Collection of Hidden Assets to Provide Order Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB25 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB5793 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB5793 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Latin America
Mexico
Organized crime
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Latin America
Mexico
Organized crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/714/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr714/BILLS-116hr714ih.pdf |