US HB7205 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To facilitate the installation of broadband infrastructure, and for other purposes.
Title
Nationwide Dig Once Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2020-06-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-06-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB7302 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB4131 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB7302 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB4131 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Computers and information technology
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Performance measurement
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
User charges and fees
Computers and information technology
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Performance measurement
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7205/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7205/BILLS-116hr7205ih.pdf |