US HB726 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Secure Data Act of 2015 Prohibits a federal agency from requiring or requesting a manufacturer, developer, or seller of any computer hardware, software, or electronic device made available to the general public to design or alter the security functions in such products to allow the surveillance of any user or the physical search of such product by any agency. Exempts from such prohibition products used by law enforcement agencies for electronic surveillance as authorized under the Communications Assistance for Law Enforcement Act.
Title
Secure Data Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] |
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House Intelligence (Permanent) |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB135 (Related) 2015-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S102-103; text of measure as introduced: CR S103)
HB2233 (Related) 2015-06-11 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E884)
HB2233 (Related) 2015-06-11 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E884)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Right of privacy
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Right of privacy
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/726/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr726/BILLS-114hr726ih.pdf |