US HB7271 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making emergency supplemental appropriations to respond to the attacks in Israel for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2024, and for other purposes.
Title
Fiscally Responsible Israel Security Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Andrew Clyde [R-GA] | Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO] |
Rep. Robert Good [R-VA] | Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6126 (Related) 2023-11-14 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure rendered moot in Senate.
HB7217 (Related) 2024-02-06 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 250 - 180 (Roll no. 38).
SB3210 (Related) 2023-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB6730 (Related) 2024-01-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB7217 (Related) 2024-02-06 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 250 - 180 (Roll no. 38).
SB3210 (Related) 2023-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB6730 (Related) 2024-01-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7271/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7271/BILLS-118hr7271ih.pdf |