US HB7332 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to convey certain Federal land to the State of Utah for inclusion in certain State parks, and for other purposes.
Title
Utah State Parks Adjustment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Celeste Maloy [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2136 (Related) 2023-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 300.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7332/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7332/BILLS-118hr7332ih.pdf |