US HB7333 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs medical center in West Palm Beach, Florida, as the "Thomas H. Corey VA Medical Center".
Title
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs medical center in West Palm Beach, Florida, as the "Thomas H. Corey VA Medical Center".
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] |
Rep. Aaron Bean [R-FL] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Cory Mills [R-FL] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Maxwell Frost [D-FL] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Anna Luna [R-FL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Laurel Lee [R-FL] |
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] |
Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D-FL] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] |
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2024-07-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-07-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4647) |
2024-07-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7333. |
2024-07-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4647-4648) |
2024-07-22 | House | Mr. Bost moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3822 (Related) 2024-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.