US HB7426 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require development and implementation of an interagency plan to assist communities affected by climate change in the Ohio River Basin, and for other purposes.
Title
Ohio River Basin Preparedness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2020-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2020-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2020-06-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Agriculture, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Air quality
Alabama
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Dams and canals
Economic performance and conditions
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental protection
Federal-Indian relations
Floods and storm protection
Georgia
Government information and archives
Illinois
Indiana
Intergovernmental relations
Kentucky
Lakes and rivers
Mississippi
North Carolina
Ohio
Pennsylvania
Public utilities and utility rates
State and local government operations
Tennessee
Virginia
Water quality
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
West Virginia
Wetlands
Alabama
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Dams and canals
Economic performance and conditions
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental protection
Federal-Indian relations
Floods and storm protection
Georgia
Government information and archives
Illinois
Indiana
Intergovernmental relations
Kentucky
Lakes and rivers
Mississippi
North Carolina
Ohio
Pennsylvania
Public utilities and utility rates
State and local government operations
Tennessee
Virginia
Water quality
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
West Virginia
Wetlands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7426/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7426/BILLS-116hr7426ih.pdf |