US HB7573 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend titles XI and XVIII of the Social Security Act to extend certain telehealth services covered by Medicare and to evaluate the impact of telehealth services on Medicare beneficiaries, and for other purposes.
Title
Telehealth Extension and Evaluation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-04-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-04-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3593 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/7573/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr7573/BILLS-117hr7573ih.pdf |