US HB7747 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs to annually report on its Solid Start program, which is an outreach program for those in their first year of separation from the military. The report must exclude any personally identifiable information regarding a veteran.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to submit to Congress an annual report on the Solid Start program of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-09-10 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2020-07-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2020-07-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8247 (Related) 2020-12-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-214. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Mental health
Telephone and wireless communication
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Congressional oversight
Mental health
Telephone and wireless communication
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7747/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7747/BILLS-116hr7747ih.pdf |