US HB8092 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to carry out certain activities to protect communities from the harmful effects of plastics, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting Communities from Plastics Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology. |
2024-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials. |
2024-04-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2024-04-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4194 (Same As) 2024-04-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/8092/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr8092/BILLS-118hr8092ih.pdf |