US HB829 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for Federal and State agency coordination in the approval of certain authorizations under the Natural Gas Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Promoting Interagency Coordination for Review of Natural Gas Pipelines Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. |
2023-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
HB1115 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 15.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB988 (Related) 2023-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
SB1456 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB1115 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 15.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB988 (Related) 2023-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
SB1456 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/829/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr829/BILLS-118hr829ih.pdf |