US HCR27 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Condemning Russia's unjust and arbitrary detention of Russian opposition leader Vladimir Kara-Murza who has stood up in defense of democracy, the rule of law, and free and fair elections in Russia.
Title
Condemning Russia's unjust and arbitrary detention of Russian opposition leader Vladimir Kara-Murza who has stood up in defense of democracy, the rule of law, and free and fair elections in Russia.
Sponsors
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Thomas Kean [R-NJ] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D-FL] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2024-06-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-06-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3699-3700) |
2024-06-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 27. |
2024-06-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3699-3701) |
2024-06-11 | House | Mr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2024-02-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 0. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SCR7 (Same As) 2023-11-06 - Held at the desk.