US HJR43 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional Amendment - Prohibits outlays for a fiscal year (except those for repayment of debt principal) from exceeding total receipts for that fiscal year (except those derived from borrowing) unless Congress, by a three-fifths rollcall vote of each chamber, authorizes a specific excess of outlays over receipts. Requires a three-fifths rollcall vote of each chamber to increase the public debt limit. Directs the President to submit a balanced budget to Congress annually. Prohibits any bill to increase revenue from becoming law unless approved by a majority of each chamber by rollcall vote. Authorizes waivers of these provisions when a declaration of war is in effect or under other specified circumstances involving military conflict. Requires Congress, by appropriate legislation, to provide that outlays for natural disasters do not count as outlays under this Amendment.
Title
Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Connie Mack [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-12 | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. | |
2009-04-22 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR78 (Related) 2010-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR22 (Related) 2009-12-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR27 (Related) 2010-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR89 (Related) 2010-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR38 (Related) 2010-08-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 511.
SJR22 (Related) 2009-12-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SJR27 (Related) 2010-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HJR89 (Related) 2010-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR38 (Related) 2010-08-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 511.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Disaster relief and insurance
Economics and public finance
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Disaster relief and insurance
Economics and public finance
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-joint-resolution/43/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hjres43/BILLS-111hjres43ih.pdf |