US HR1065 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Denouncing the Biden administration's immigration policies.
Title
Denouncing the Biden administration's immigration policies.
Sponsors
Rep. Monica De La Cruz [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution RC# 85 (Y: 226 N: 193 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-03-12 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 226 - 193 (Roll no. 85). |
2024-03-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2024-03-12 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 1065, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Fry demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2024-03-12 | House | The previous question was ordered on the resolution and the preamble pursuant to the rule. |
2024-03-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1065. |
2024-03-12 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6276 and H. Res. 1065. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 6276 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit. Resolution provides for consideration of H. Res. 1065 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. |
2024-03-12 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1071. |
2024-03-12 | House | Rule H. Res. 1071 passed House. |
2024-03-11 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1071 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6276 and H. Res. 1065. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 6276 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit. Resolution provides for consideration of H. Res. 1065 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1071 (Related) 2024-03-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR608 (Same As) 2024-03-21 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SR608 (Same As) 2024-03-21 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.